Financial history THE COMBINED HARMAN'S GIFT, CHARLOTTE WALSH, EMILY JAMES AND GEORGE TOWNSEND LECTURESHIP CHARITY 2003

Charity number: 312443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £656 £797 £797 £102 £94
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A