BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST

Charity number: 312516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 November 2017 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required