BRITISH AND FOREIGN SCHOOL SOCIETY TRUST

Charity number: 312516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.80k £4.95k £4.92k £5.41k £3.95k
Total expenditure £1.46k £3.90k £4.93k £7.88k £5.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A