KING ALFRED SCHOOL SOCIETY

Charity number: 312590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Silvanus Nevin Trustee 07 February 2017 None on record
PHILIP JOHN WHALE Trustee 10 May 2013 None on record
Robert John Dye Trustee 11 December 2018 None on record
IAN LAMING Trustee None on record
Nick Friedlos Trustee 04 March 2016 None on record
MS S A PHILLIPS Trustee
THE ASSOCIATION OF GOVERNING BODIES OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS Received: On time
MRS ARETA HAUTMAN Trustee None on record
Emily Miranda Holmstoel Trustee 12 February 2019 None on record
Sophie Ricard Trustee 19 May 2015 None on record
Liam Axel Griffin Michaels Trustee 12 February 2019 None on record
Alistair Gordon McConville Trustee 07 February 2017 None on record
Grace Edghill Trustee 12 February 2019 None on record
Sheila Bernadette Jaswon Trustee 06 February 2018 None on record
Christian Rainer Schmidt Trustee 12 February 2019 None on record
Samantha Gail Jukes-Adams Trustee 07 February 2017 None on record
KARA DRUMMOND CONTI Trustee None on record
Sophie Diane Silocchi Trustee 07 February 2017 None on record
FIONA HACKETT Trustee None on record
Sandra Denicke-Polcher Trustee 07 February 2017 None on record
Annabel Jane Elizabeth Cody Chair 14 March 2014 None on record