Trustees Forest School, London

Charity number: 312677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID THOMAS MONTI WILSON Chair 28 June 2013
None on record
Yemisi Gibbons Trustee 30 August 2023
None on record
Steven Berryman Trustee 17 June 2022
UK Music Masters Ltd.
Received: On time
SPITALFIELDS FESTIVAL LIMITED
Received: On time
THE CHARTERED COLLEGE OF TEACHING
Received: On time
Paul Sampat Trustee 17 June 2022
None on record
Simon Thomas Perry Trustee 23 November 2018
None on record
Geraldine Claire Atlee Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
Dr SANIYA MARRIAM HADI Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record
JANE DAVIES Trustee 25 June 2015
WEST LODGE SCHOOL LIMITED
Received: On time
Neena Lall OBE Trustee 27 February 2014
None on record
William Fuller Trustee 04 December 2013
None on record
THE VENERABLE ELWIN WESLEY COCKETT Trustee 28 June 2012
THE REVEREND DOCTOR GEORGE RICHARDS' CHARITY FOR POOR CLERGYMEN
Overdue by 200 days
THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time