ADDEY AND STANHOPE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 312693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

CO-Educational School Providing free education for children within its catchment area of Deptford/New Cross. Annual Distribution of Funds to Pensioners of Deptford as per its Charitable Trust Provides amenities to the Local Community

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £25,288
Total expenditure: £123,831

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lewisham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 October 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Babara Smith Chair 05 October 2015
None on record
Tembisa Yawa Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
Roz Caught Trustee 02 December 2024
None on record
Melissa Schramm Trustee 26 June 2023
None on record
Chenai Mutuma Trustee 26 June 2023
None on record
Rob Watt Trustee 28 November 2022
None on record
Brandon Charleston Trustee 07 January 2020
None on record
Paul Trynka Trustee 28 September 2015
None on record
Jan Shapiro Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
ZAIDA FLORIAN Trustee 07 January 2014
None on record
Emmanuel Atuah Trustee 04 December 2013
None on record
PATRICIA BILLINGS Trustee
None on record
JAMES POLLARD Trustee
H J W WILKINS BEQUEST
Received: On time
BERYL ROBERTS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £63.93k £20.97k £23.99k £54.68k £25.29k
Total expenditure £151.12k £102.98k £106.59k £113.49k £123.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £54.78k £12.17k £15.05k £44.97k £15.18k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 July 2022 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
ESTABLISHED IN OR AROUND 1989 - NO GOVERNING INSTRUMENT
Charitable objects
PRIZES FOR GEOGRAPHY FIELD STUDIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 08 October 1992 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
472 NEW CROSS ROAD
NEW CROSS
LONDON
SE14 6TJ
Phone:
02083056100