THE CENTRAL FOUNDATION SCHOOLS OF LONDON

Charity number: 312695
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £9.61m £2.29m £2.20m £2.72m £4.04m
Total expenditure £1.42m £2.62m £2.90m £2.35m £2.30m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.24m £761.00k £714.00k £1.60m £2.97m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.37m £1.53m £1.49m £1.11m £1.07m
Income - Other £0 £0 £6.61m £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.11m £2.41m £2.66m £2.14m £2.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £202.00k £240.00k £210.00k £167.00k
Expenditure - Governance £57.00k £54.00k £53.00k £75.00k £98.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £2.36m £0 £1.09m £0
Expenditure - Investment management £255.00k £202.00k £240.00k £210.00k £167.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0