THE WHITECHAPEL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mrs Lucy Folkes Trustee 21 January 2014
DAVENANT FOUNDATION THE REYNOLDS SCHOOL PRIVATE FUND Received: On time
Rev Christopher Davies Trustee 18 October 2016
LOUGHTON YOUTH PROJECT Received: On time
DAVENANT FOUNDATION THE REYNOLDS SCHOOL PRIVATE FUND Received: On time
MIKE HICKS Trustee
DAVENANT FOUNDATION THE REYNOLDS SCHOOL PRIVATE FUND Received: On time
MARY VINE-MORRIS Trustee 29 January 2013
DAVENANT FOUNDATION THE REYNOLDS SCHOOL PRIVATE FUND Received: On time
Sally Temple Trustee 21 January 2014
DAVENANT FOUNDATION THE REYNOLDS SCHOOL PRIVATE FUND Received: On time
David Prosser Trustee 11 December 2018
DAVENANT FOUNDATION THE REYNOLDS SCHOOL PRIVATE FUND Received: On time
Glynne Anthony Trustee 21 January 2014
DAVENANT FOUNDATION THE REYNOLDS SCHOOL PRIVATE FUND Received: On time
HOWARD SMITH Trustee 08 July 2014
DAVENANT FOUNDATION THE REYNOLDS SCHOOL PRIVATE FUND Received: On time