Financial history JOHN ROAN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £621.06k £444.89k £443.81k £475.47k £520.09k
Total expenditure £717.36k £360.34k £546.02k £421.62k £398.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £64
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £621.06k N/A N/A N/A £520.03k
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £499.27k N/A N/A N/A £234.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds £218.10k N/A N/A N/A £164.53k
Expenditure - Governance £45.37k N/A N/A N/A £22.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £228.42k N/A N/A N/A £211.79k
Expenditure - Investment management £218.10k N/A N/A N/A £164.53k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0