THE AMERICAN SCHOOL IN LONDON EDUCATIONAL TRUST LTD

Charity number: 312738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 11 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 22 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 21 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 21 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 06 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 20 December 2016 On time Download