JAMES ALLEN'S GIRLS' SCHOOL

Charity number: 312750
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2008 09 February 2009 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 09 February 2009 On time
Annual return 31 July 2007 29 February 2008 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 29 February 2008 On time
Annual return 31 July 2006 23 January 2007 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 23 January 2007 On time
Annual return 31 July 2005 23 March 2006 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2005 23 March 2006 On time
Annual return 31 July 2004 25 May 2005 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2004 25 May 2005 On time