JAMES ALLEN'S GIRLS' SCHOOL

Charity number: 312750
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2004 31/07/2005 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008
Total gross income £11.42m £12.04m £17.58m £14.61m £15.77m
Total expenditure £11.54m £12.22m £12.74m £14.19m £15.13m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £77.06k £405.85k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £1.06m £1.19m
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £11.76m £12.54m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £396.23k £348.74k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £1.31m £1.29m
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £205.04k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £12.66m £13.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £56.84k £120.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £602.57k £684.92k