EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES ADMINISTERED BY GREATER LONDON COUNCIL
Charity number: 312768
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide prizes for the pupils of Ernest Bevin School in Wandsworth
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Total income: £281
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout London
Governance
Registration history:
- 17 July 1968: Standard registration
- 15 May 2001: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113 | £122 | £136 | £154 | £281 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 14 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 14 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 07 August 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 27 June 2007 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS.
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
Linked charities
- A J DRING ENGLISH PRIZE IN CONNEXION WITH SCOTT-LIDGETT SCHOOL
- ALAN GRANT MEMORIAL PRIZE FOR MUSIC
- ARTHUR TOMLINGSON PRIZE FOR EFFORT AND GOOD INFLUENCE IN CONNEXION WITH RICHARD GOBDEN COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL
- BIOLOGY PRIZE
- HERSEE MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND
- HILDA THOMSETT PRIZE IN CONNEXION WITH ELTHAM GREEN COUNTY SECONDARY SCHOOL
- HONOR OAK PARENTS COMMITTEE FUND
- JULIUS GRANT PRIZES FOR SPOKEN ENGLISH IN CONNEXION WITH FOREST HILL SCHOOL
- MARY GRAY PRIZE FUND
- MCLOUGHLIN MEMORIAL PRIZE FUND IN CONNEXION WITH ERNEST BEVIN SCHOOL
- ROBERT BUNTING SCHOLARSHIP
- T W MELLUISH PRIZE FOR LATIN IN CONNEXION WITH ERNEST BEVIN SCHOOL
- TRISTRAM PRIZE IN CONNEXION WITH SCOTT LIDGETT S B SCHOOL
- W A ALDWINKLE LIBRARY FUND
- W A ALDWINKLE PRIZE FUND
Governing document
ORDER OF SCHOOLS SUB-COMMITTEE DATED 2ND DECEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
A PRIZE FOR ENGLISH STUDIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
- 17 July 1968 : Standard registration
- 15 May 2001 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window