Accounts and annual returns LONDON SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY

Charity number: 312778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 17 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 10 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window