Financial history LONDON SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY

Charity number: 312778
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £3.42m £3.36m £3.63m £3.60m £3.21m
Total expenditure £3.69m £3.72m £3.59m £3.76m £3.70m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £114.75k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £231.09k £378.29k £319.25k £383.04k £319.79k
Income - Other trading activities £58.04k £49.45k £24.86k £43.86k £72.25k
Income - Charitable activities £2.73m £2.55m £2.89m £2.86m £2.53m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £342.91k £304.29k £286.98k £256.71k £250.35k
Income - Other £58.39k £74.30k £109.20k £62.24k £33.72k
Income - Legacies £29.18k £133.11k £89.71k £171.16k £110.45k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.54m £3.58m £3.42m £3.57m £3.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds £91.93k £97.41k £95.02k £100.35k £102.75k
Expenditure - Governance £11.43k £12.32k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £33.76k £39.59k £39.94k £40.48k £44.54k
Expenditure - Other £59.83k £49.15k £80.86k £87.16k £50.13k