Trustees LONDON SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY
Charity number: 312778

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Hughes | Chair | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Alton Bell | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Lydia Rose Lee | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Peter Stanley Oakes | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Revd Dr Jennifer Ruth Williams | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Kate Alexandra Meathrel | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Graham Alan Cray | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Johnny Douglas | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|||||||
PAUL SMITH | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|||||||
Margaret Marian Doyle | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.