NEWCOMEN COLLETT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
AMIR ADAM EDEN Trustee 28 September 2017 None on record
ALEXANDER LEIFFHEIDT M PHIL Trustee 11 December 2008 None on record
Janet Simpson Trustee 13 December 2018 None on record
Neha Jain Trustee 09 March 2017 None on record
ROBIN LOVELL Chair 15 March 1999 None on record
Janet Goodland Trustee 12 December 2013 None on record
Rev Michael Rawson Trustee 10 March 2016
THE DEAN OF SOUTHWARK'S FUND Received: On time
Peter MacFarlane Trustee 26 September 2014 None on record
Timothy James McNally Trustee 14 December 2017
WAKEFIELD AND TETLEY TRUST Received: On time
SURREY DISPENSARY Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. JAMES WITH CHRISTCHURCH AND ST. CRISPIN, BERMONDSEY Overdue by 401 days
ST GEORGE THE MARTYR CHARITY Received: On time
SOUTHWARK CHARITIES Received: On time
NATIONAL LIBERAL CLUB BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
ROBERT VICTOR ASHDOWN Trustee 22 August 2005 None on record