Accounts and annual returns LADY FLORENCE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 312816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 02 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 July 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 July 2020 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 19 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 04 July 2018 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 26 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window