Financial history LADY FLORENCE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 312816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £229.96k £248.75k £238.69k £263.58k £251.29k
Total expenditure £236.45k £222.32k £237.88k £223.79k £278.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A