Trustees LADY FLORENCE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 312816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dan Burraway Trustee 29 April 2021
THE 999 CLUB AND LADY FLORENCE TRUST
Received: On time
Arti Modhwadia Trustee 29 April 2021
THE 999 CLUB AND LADY FLORENCE TRUST
Received: On time
Mamta Gupta Trustee 29 April 2021
THE 999 CLUB AND LADY FLORENCE TRUST
Received: On time
Ijay Onyechi Onyechi Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
Manlio B Trovato Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Julie Anne Greenwood Trustee 15 May 2018
None on record
Gordon McCullough Trustee 10 April 2018
THE 999 CLUB AND LADY FLORENCE TRUST
Received: On time
Toritseju Mayomi Trustee 10 April 2018
THE 999 CLUB AND LADY FLORENCE TRUST
Received: On time
Timothy Coleman Trustee 10 April 2018
None on record
Joanne Tanner Trustee 28 March 2017
THE 999 CLUB AND LADY FLORENCE TRUST
Received: On time