THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF DRAMATIC ART

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and operate an academy of dramatic art. To advance the art of drama by means of giving instruction in and promoting the study, practice and knowledge of dramatic literature. To promote and supervise such instruction most condusive to the cultivation and dissemination of the art of drama in the United Kingdom and English speaking world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£15,306,000
Donations and legacies | £1.01m | |
Charitable activities | £4.06m | |
Other trading activities | £7.69m | |
Investments | £109.00k | |
Other | £2.44m |
Total expenditure:
£16,119,000
Raising funds | £6.47m | |
Charitable activities | £9.65m | |
Other | £0 |
-£5,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,151,000 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £6.47m | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.65m |
People

193 Employee(s)
20 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 6 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Camden
Governance
- 30 October 1962: Standard registration
- 04 May 2023: Funds received from 1115903 THE CARNE TRUST
- R A D A (Working name)
- RADA (Working name)
- THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF DRAMATIC ARTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marcus Ryder | Chair | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Mx Katherine Louisa Friedli Walton | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Simkins | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jacob Steele | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rebecca Mary Snell | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Walker Carswell | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Matthew James Leventhall | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Elizabeth Ballinger | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Middleton | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
JUDITH CHAN | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Professor Judith Buchanan | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Miranda Wayland | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Niamh Dowling | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|||||||
Shona Spence | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Selwood | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Caroline Spicer | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Tanya Rose | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
John Romeo | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Maxine Peake | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Lolita Chakrabarti OBE | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.15m | £11.41m | £8.96m | £13.68m | £15.31m | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.89m | £15.66m | £13.03m | £14.73m | £16.12m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £127.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.12m | £960.00k | £2.23m | £2.15m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.42m | £1.86m | £2.02m | £2.02m | £1.01m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £6.40m | £4.63m | £3.36m | £6.14m | £7.69m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.21m | £4.79m | £3.49m | £5.41m | £4.06m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £610.00k | £718.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £123.00k | £130.00k | £103.00k | £105.00k | £109.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.44m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.07m | £33.00k | £610.00k | £922.00k | £258.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.02m | £11.42m | £9.72m | £9.49m | £9.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.87m | £4.24m | £3.31m | £5.24m | £6.47m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £28.00k | £28.00k | £53.00k | £46.00k | £113.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £17.00k | £18.00k | £18.00k | £17.00k | £62.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £34.44m | £31.63m | £32.00m | £31.41m | £30.96m | |
|
Long-term investments | £12.17m | £11.37m | £8.59m | £6.47m | £5.50m | |
|
Other assets | £4.04m | £2.44m | £2.71m | £5.37m | £5.76m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.30m | -£1.58m | -£492.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.56m | £6.50m | £7.58m | £8.63m | £8.40m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 June 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 01 June 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 16 JULY 1920 AS AMENDED BY ORDER IN COUNCIL DATED 22 DECEMBER 1971 as amended by an Order in Council on 21 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND CARRY ON A SCHOOL OR ACADEMY OF DRAMATIC ART. TO ADVANCE THE ART OF THE DRAMA BY MEANS OF GIVING INSTRUCTION IN AND PROMOTING THE STUDY, PRACTICE AND KNOWLEDGE OF DRAMATIC LITERATURE AND ACTING IN ALL OR ANY OF ITS BRANCHES EXCLUSIVELY. TO PROMOTE AND SUPERVISE SUCH INSTRUCTION AS MAY BE THOUGHT MOST CONDUCIVE TO THE CULTIVATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE ART OF THE DRAMA IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE BRITISH DOMINIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL ACADEMY OF DRAMATIC ART
62-64 GOWER STREET
LONDON
WC1E 6ED
- Phone:
- 02079084893
- Email:
- enquiries@rada.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window