Accounts and annual returns LAMDA LTD

Charity number: 312821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 20 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 12 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 12 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 07 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 07 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 30 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window