Financial history LAMDA LTD

Charity number: 312821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £13.50m £11.81m £12.99m £10.47m £10.92m
Total expenditure £11.31m £11.93m £13.25m £12.25m £11.99m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £738.54k £669.05k N/A £1.50m £1.73m
Income - Donations and legacies £3.00m £912.96k £1.18m £801.43k £802.05k
Income - Other trading activities £371.12k £137.41k £333.51k £249.92k £0
Income - Charitable activities £10.13m £10.76m £11.47m £8.81m £10.12m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.53k £508 £3.28k £5.84k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £595.74k £0
Income - Legacies £11.41k £0 £30.00k £0 £198.25k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.72m £11.41m £12.54m £11.70m £11.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £594.30k £332.90k £487.71k £364.30k £0
Expenditure - Governance £252.18k £0 £146.16k £86.37k £25.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £189.74k £215.98k £186.09k £0