ROYAL ACADEMY OF DANCE

Charity number: 312826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 20 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 24 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 24 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 04 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 04 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 26 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 26 May 2017 On time Download