Financial history THE CITY OF LONDON CORPORATION COMBINED EDUCATION CHARITY

Charity number: 312836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £37.53k £41.23k £42.76k £46.89k £61.68k
Total expenditure £7.05k £45.72k £58.31k £0 £8.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A