Trustees HENRY WOOD ACCOMMODATION TRUST

Charity number: 312839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DENNIS LESLIE SCARD Chair
None on record
Nina Victoria Swann Trustee 07 June 2022
LAMBETH ORCHESTRA FUND
Received: On time
Paul John Thornton Keene Trustee 08 December 2021
CAMDEN MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
Christine Kinsella Trustee 09 May 2018
SOUTH LONDON SINFONIA
Received: On time
THE RIOT ENSEMBLE
Received: On time
MUSIC EDUCATION COUNCIL
Received: On time
DI XIAO Trustee 12 December 2016
None on record
HELEN FAULKNER Trustee 13 May 2014
THE RVW TRUST
Received: On time
THE GERALD COKE HANDEL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE LOAN FUND FOR MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS
Received: On time
VAUGHAN WILLIAMS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CHRISTINA COKER Trustee 20 May 2013
THE DARTINGTON INTERNATIONAL SUMMER SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DAVID CROOK Trustee
None on record
ROGER JOHN POPE Trustee
None on record