BUILDING CRAFTS COLLEGE

Charity number: 312856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £2.70m £2.98m £2.99m £2.81m £2.91m
Total expenditure £2.62m £2.89m £2.99m £2.84m £2.89m
Income from government contracts £781.57k £1.07m £1.16m £1.06m £1.20m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £1.06m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £796.99k £895.22k £1.05m £1.06m £1.29m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.90m £2.05m £1.94m £1.75m £1.61m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.64k £1.73k £1.80k £1.79k £1.77k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.62m £2.89m £2.99m £2.84m £2.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £46.60k £46.96k £46.44k £46.44k £21.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0