NELMES SCHOOLS PARENTS/TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 312971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise funds for Nelmes Primary School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £19,392
Total expenditure: £9,980

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Havering

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 January 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Meera Darji Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Helen Goyal Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £16.09k £1.96k £16.27k £15.06k £19.39k
Total expenditure £5.14k £918 £5.91k £7.10k £9.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 04 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Nelmes Primary School
Wingletye Lane
Hornchurch
RM11 3BX
Phone:
01708447676
Website:

No information available