Trustees THE MARINE SOCIETY AND SEA CADETS

Charity number: 313013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEREMY JOHN HARLEY PENN Chair 11 October 2017
ROYAL MUSEUMS GREENWICH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Gareth Hampton Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Laurelle Brant Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Michael Schofield Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
David Dingle CBE Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Jonathan Robertshaw Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Leonie Austin Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
David Derbyshire Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Vice Admiral Sir Simon Jonathan Woodcock KCB OBE Trustee 10 October 2018
None on record
JASON JOHN KINGHORN Trustee 18 July 2018
None on record
JOHN CLIVE CECIL MAY OBE DL Trustee 14 October 2015
OXFORDSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Simon Figgis Trustee 09 July 2014
None on record
Elizabeth Cassidy Trustee 28 June 2014
None on record
CAPTAIN IAN MCNAUGHT CVO MNM Trustee 11 December 2013
THE CORPORATION OF TRINITY HOUSE OF DEPTFORD STROND
Received: On time
ALAN ROBERT WILLIAM MARSH Trustee 25 January 2012
INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR AIDS TO NAVIGATION
Received: On time
ROBERT WOODS CBE Trustee
THE OXFORD HOUSE DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE SEA CADET ASSOCIATION
Received: On time