CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF LIBRARY AND INFORMATION PROFESSIONALS

Charity number: 313014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.74m £4.46m £4.18m £3.92m £3.95m
Total expenditure £5.21m £4.84m £5.18m £4.09m £3.93m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £169.50k £167.50k £782.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.67k £243 £173.96k £167.78k £918.21k
Income - Other trading activities £799.95k £897.77k £956.74k £973.37k £878.08k
Income - Charitable activities £3.83m £3.46m £2.97m £2.71m £2.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £106.53k £101.99k £81.93k £66.96k £49.59k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.32k £0 £0 £0 £41.67k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.98m £4.61m £4.93m £3.83m £3.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £225.95k £233.27k £251.61k £264.58k £267.05k
Expenditure - Governance £87.14k £82.36k £1.05m £0 £850.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0