CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF LIBRARY AND INFORMATION PROFESSIONALS

Charity number: 313014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Clare Jolly Trustee 01 April 2021 None on record
Dr Helen Mary Workman PhD MCLIP Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Shirley Yearwood-Jackman Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Stephen James Phillips Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Susan Gail Ball Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Alison Brettle Professor Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Binni Brynolf Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
Jo Webb Trustee 28 June 2016 None on record
John Aneurin Varley Trevor-Allen Chair 17 July 2015
FRG LTD Received: 4 days late
Nicola Jane Davies Trustee 21 May 2019 None on record
Steve Williams Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
ALISON ROSEMARY WHEELER Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Simon Burton Trustee 28 January 2021 None on record
Susan Mary Joy Lacey Bryant Trustee 24 January 2019 None on record