Financial history THE MUSEUMS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 313024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.37m £2.27m £2.14m £2.17m £2.40m
Total expenditure £2.23m £2.47m £2.34m £2.34m £1.72m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £633.13k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £122.56k
Income - Donations and legacies £462.11k £333.29k £261.30k £140.07k £865.73k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.78m £1.83m £1.75m £1.89m £1.30m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £108.70k £95.09k £102.15k £141.48k £127.00k
Income - Other £24.63k £20.16k £31.45k £0 £112.56k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.23m £2.47m £2.34m £2.34m £1.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £34.66k £15.88k £15.02k £13.95k £6.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £28.66k £0 £0 £37.18k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0