Trustees THE MUSEUMS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 313024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sara Kassam Trustee 15 October 2021
None on record
Rachel Rogers Trustee 15 October 2021
None on record
Michelle McGrath Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Nivek Amichund Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Michael Terwey Trustee 23 July 2020
None on record
Stella Byrne Trustee 23 July 2020
None on record
Dianna Djokey Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Steven Miller Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
HEATHER LEES Trustee 01 August 2017
None on record
Gillian Findlay Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Simon Brown Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record