Trustees THE BANKERS BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 313080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONY RAMOS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sharon Midwinter | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marco Evans | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Allan Douglas Stewart | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Hughes | Trustee | 09 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Horler | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lena Breen | Trustee | 26 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL CLARINGBOLD | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
LILLIAN BOYLE | Trustee | 20 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.