THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR EARLY CHILDHOOD EDUCATION

Charity number: 313082
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £624.53k £463.43k £450.41k £460.82k £608.97k
Total expenditure £623.11k £512.54k £512.54k £416.04k £560.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £99.62k £100.30k £232.36k
Income from government grants £144.48k £0 £0 N/A £232.36k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.47k N/A N/A N/A £307
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £467.50k N/A N/A N/A £608.21k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £925 N/A N/A N/A £302
Income - Other £154.64k N/A N/A N/A £145
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £467.15k N/A N/A N/A £560.54k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A £8.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £155.95k N/A N/A N/A £0