THE DUCHESS OF LEEDS FOUNDATION FOR BOYS AND GIRLS

Charity number: 313103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The net income of the foundation, after the payment of administrative expenses, is used to fund exhibitions and other benefits to Roman Catholic children attending Catholic schools and who, being resident in England, Wales or the Channel Islands, have lost both parents, or are fatherless or whose fathers do not provide them with effective financial support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £86,791
Total expenditure: £64,211

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHILIP ARTHUR NICHOLAS NOEL Chair 24 March 1998
None on record
Rev Nicholas Rothon Trustee 09 April 2025
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Received: On time
SECULAR CLERGY NEW COMMON FUND
Received: On time
MR HARRY SCROPE Trustee 01 August 2014
None on record
REV GRAHAM PRESTON Trustee 13 November 2011
None on record
MARGARET MARY WADDINGHAM Trustee 01 April 2009
THE CAMBRIDGE NAZARETH TRUST
Received: On time
JULIAN NICOLAS STOURTON Trustee 30 April 1997
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £49.24k £24.63k £85.06k £25.94k £86.79k
Total expenditure £40.94k £37.85k £44.71k £60.68k £64.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 Kenton Road
Harrow
HA1 2BW
Phone:
02084221950
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available