HAKLUYT SOCIETY

Charity number: 313168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 01 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time Download