HAKLUYT SOCIETY

Charity number: 313168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

31 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR GLYNDWR WILLIAMS Trustee None on record
Major Anthony Keeley Trustee 17 June 2020 None on record
Claire Jowitt Professor Trustee 19 June 2019 None on record
Professor Michael Gerard Brennan Trustee 20 June 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR JOYCE LORIMER Trustee 24 June 2015 None on record
Royal Geographical Society Trustee 01 January 2020
THE GINO WATKINS MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
Professor Nandini DAS Trustee 17 June 2021
THE RECTOR AND SCHOLARS OF EXETER COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD Received: On time
DR MARGARET MAKEPEACE Trustee 22 June 2016 None on record
Peter Barber Trustee 19 June 2019
MEMORIAL SCROLLS TRUST Recently registered
Dr Eva Johanna Holmberg Trustee 19 June 2019 None on record
Dr John Smedley Trustee 20 June 2018 None on record
Dr GLORIA CHRISTINE CLIFTON Chair None on record
Professor Ladan Niayesh Trustee 21 June 2017 None on record
Megan Barford Trustee 20 June 2018 None on record
Professor Felipe Fernandez-Armesto Trustee 21 June 2017 None on record
BRUCE HUNTER Trustee 22 June 2016 None on record
Dr Guido van Meersbergen Trustee 17 June 2020 None on record
DR SARAH JACQUELINE TYACKE CB Trustee
IMAGO MUNDI LIMITED Received: On time
J B HARLEY RESEARCH FELLOWSHIPS TRUST Received: On time
Alastair Bridges Trustee 20 June 2018 None on record
Dr Bertie Mandelblatt Trustee 17 June 2021 None on record
PROFESSOR WILLIAM FRANCIS RYAN Trustee None on record
Dr Catherine Scheybeler Trustee 19 June 2019 None on record
Dr Derek Elliott Trustee 17 June 2021 None on record
Dr Katie Bank Trustee 17 June 2021 None on record
Lionel Knight Trustee 19 June 2019 None on record
DR Katherine Ashley Parker Trustee 22 June 2016 None on record
MIKE BARRITT Trustee 20 June 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, HESWALL Received: On time
Professor Daniel Carey Trustee 17 June 2020 None on record
PROFESSOR JAMES ARTHUR BENNETT Trustee 22 June 2016 None on record
Anthony Payne Trustee 19 June 2019 None on record
RAYMOND JOHN HOWGEGO Trustee 22 June 2016
CATERHAM UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY Received: On time
THE EAST SURREY MUSEUM Received: On time