Accounts and annual returns ART WORKERS' GUILD TRUSTEES LTD

Charity number: 313228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 23 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 23 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 29 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 19 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 17 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 17 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 27 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window