Trustees THE BRITISH INSTITUTION FUND

Charity number: 313248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joyce Cairns PRSA Trustee 13 March 2019
None on record
Betty Brown Trustee 16 June 2018
None on record
Des McMahon PPRHA Trustee 28 January 2018
None on record
ROSA SEPPLE Trustee 09 March 2017
ROYAL INSTITUTE OF PAINTERS IN WATER COLOURS
Received: On time
Ian Kiaer Trustee 22 November 2016
UNIVERSITY BIBLE FELLOWSHIP CHURCH
Received: On time
penelope jane johnson Trustee 02 October 2014
THE BRIDGET RILEY ART FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PROFESSOR ANDREW STAHL Trustee 02 June 2014
CONTEMPORARY ARTS TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Jennifer Powell Trustee 09 May 2014
None on record
MICHAEL CLARIDGE Trustee
None on record