MARC FITCH FUND

Charity number: 313303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 26 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 22 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 20 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 20 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 16 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 16 November 2016 On time Download