MARC FITCH FUND

Charity number: 313303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £256.50k £263.00k £264.80k £259.55k £233.89k
Total expenditure £300.32k £150.17k £265.49k £331.62k £128.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A