Trustees THE CLASSICAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 313371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. Judith Margaret Mossman | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Peter Swallow | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Keng Liang Goh | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anastacia Holding | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Spencer Anderson | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Arlene Holmes-Henderson | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Syrithe Pugh | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alex McAuley | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sharon Marshall | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP HOOKER | Trustee | 11 April 1999 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.