Financial history THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF LOGISTICS AND TRANSPORT

Charity number: 313376
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £511.00k £418.00k £627.93k £581.74k £626.00k
Total expenditure £527.00k £425.00k £613.29k £520.42k £678.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £487.00k N/A £603.49k £560.82k £608.00k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £24.00k N/A £24.44k £20.92k £18.00k
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £521.00k N/A £607.80k £515.09k £672.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.00k N/A £5.48k £5.32k £6.00k
Expenditure - Governance £123.00k N/A £46.22k £139.59k £393.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £18.68k £15.68k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £6.00k N/A £3.90k £3.70k £6.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0