Trustees THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF LOGISTICS AND TRANSPORT

Charity number: 313376
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ian Kenneth Jones Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Jennie Kristina Martin Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Chief Teete Owusu-Nortey Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Paul David Sainthouse Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Jane Green Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
DAVID PUGH Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
Jan Steenberg Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record