THE NEW BERLIOZ EDITION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preparation for publication a scholarly edition of all of Berlioz's musical works, the promotion of research into the primary sources of his music, and the dissemination of knowledge about his life and works.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 February 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Alastair Aberdare | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sarah Hibberd | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Barbara Kelly | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julian Gordon Rushton | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Andrew Frampton | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|||||
DR PAUL WILLIAM BANKS | Trustee | 14 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Banks | Trustee | 14 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Professor David Philip Charlton | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Hugh John MacDonald | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Carter | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.29k | £32.59k | £10.79k | £18.90k | £18.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.47k | £20.98k | £9.83k | £27.00k | £21.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 DECEMBER 1967 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 13 JANUARY 2000. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05/11/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION OF MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROMOTION OF KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE WORKS OF HECTOR BERLIOZ AND IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Church Road
Earley
READING
RG6 1HT
- Phone:
- 07989824878
- Email:
- newberliozedition@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window