THE GRUBB INSTITUTE OF BEHAVIOURAL STUDIES LIMITED

Charity number: 313460
Charity is insolvent
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2009 31/10/2010 31/10/2011 31/10/2012 31/10/2013
Total gross income £529.72k £1.37m £353.15k £414.41k £410.35k
Total expenditure £597.55k £588.66k £698.37k £855.22k £662.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £14.83k £12.30k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £2.34k £1.89k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £512.49k £386.08k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £63 £67 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £969.33k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £580.94k £562.75k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £16.60k £25.92k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A