THE INNS OF COURT AND THE BAR EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ICBET's objectives are achieved through the award of grants and the Trust holds funds to be applied in the support of education and training for the Bar. In particular, its funds are designed to support the activities of organisations engaged in the further education of pupils and young and recently qualified barristers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 January 1964: Standard registration
- ICBET (Working name)
- COUNCIL OF LEGAL EDUCATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Duncan Henry Rowland Matthews KC | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mr Justice Martin Alexander Griffiths | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Imran Benson | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kiril Waite | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
HHJ Lynn Margaret Tatyon KC | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Wood | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
William East | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Colin Edelman KC | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD FRANCIS COUSINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.52k | £54.13k | £59.06k | £54.85k | £53.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.66k | £96.92k | £113.15k | £98.83k | £118.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 December 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 December 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 03 DEC 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03 JUL 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO FURTHER THE DUE ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE AND TO ADVANCE LEGAL EDUCATION IN EACH CASE BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO STUDENTS ASPIRING TO BE CALLED TO THE BAR OF ENGLAND AND WALES OR PERSONS WHO HAVING BEEN SO CALLED ARE IN PUPILLAGE OR WHO HAVE HELD A PRACTISING CERTIFICATE FOR THREE YEARS OR LESS AND ACCORDINGLY ARE IN NEED OF FURTHER EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 17 January 1964 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bar Tribunal & Adjudication Service
9 Gray's Inn Square
LONDON
WC1R 5JD
- Phone:
- 02078220762
- Email:
- hdawes@coic.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window