Trustees JOINT UNIVERSITY COUNCIL
Charity number: 313573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ian Elliott | Chair | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Murphy | Trustee | 12 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karl O'Connor | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Russ Glennon | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Hugh McLaughlin | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karin Bottom | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Patricia Cartney | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Fitchett | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr JANET MELVILLE-WISEMAN | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.