Financial history Montessori St Nicholas Ltd

Charity number: 313636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £2.33m £1.97m £1.21m £992.55k £1.43m
Total expenditure £2.49m £2.57m £4.14m £3.26m £2.11m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £600.15k £100 £254.19k £1.05k £65.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.52m £1.36m £861.27k £667.15k £202.27k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £186.57k £142.40k £90.62k £32.81k £64.36k
Income - Other £19.31k £463.53k £4.92k £291.54k £1.10m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £254.19k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.48m £2.57m £4.14m £3.26m £2.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.13k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £252.37k £142.25k £0 £105.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £39.48k £488.14k £0 £1.32m
Expenditure - Investment management £6.13k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0